THE MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL COUNTRY HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides self catering holiday accommodation for low income families and individuals who would otherwise not have a holiday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 17 March 1965: Standard registration
- MELLOR COUNTRY HOUSE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN SIMPSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Glenys Milligan | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Mark Wilson | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Aimson | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cunningham | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Heywood | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Clark | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK VINCENT MATHER | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DANIELLE LOUISE MATHER | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Adamson | Trustee | 17 July 1999 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ADAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.55k | £71.02k | £86.68k | £66.80k | £81.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.41k | £45.13k | £66.17k | £68.07k | £76.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £16.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 19TH DAY OF APRIL 1919 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 20 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A HOLIDAY HOME FOR POOR PERSONS OF EITHER SEX DWELLING IN MANCHESTER OR SALFORD AND WHETHER MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR NOT.
Area of benefit
THE CITIES OF MANCHESTER AND SALFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
299 LONGHURST LANE
MELLOR
STOCKPORT
SK6 5PP
- Phone:
- 01614271893
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window