CATHOLIC HOUSING AID SOCIETY (WEST LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Catholic Housing Aid Society (West London) was set up to assist with donations or loans to St Vincent's Family Housing Association (a registered housing landlord). We also make grants to charities who provide housing to those in need. We also provide grants to individuals who have a housing problem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Augustine Cruise | Chair | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence Patrick Cruise | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Buckner | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Theobald | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Slater | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy de Souza | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chi Fung Tony Chui | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.71k | £7.37k | £88.07k | £15.53k | £8.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.50k | £25.23k | £18.40k | £18.81k | £13.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE SOCIETY AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1965.
Charitable objects
ASSISTING PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS IN CASES OF SOCIAL HARDSHIP OR ECONOMIC MISFORTUNE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS WHETHER MEMBERS OF THE SOCIEY OR NOT TO FIND LIVING ACCOMMODATION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 3(A) TO (D))
Area of benefit
WEST LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 CONNAUGHT ROAD
SUTTON
SM1 3PJ
- Phone:
- 02087152337
- Email:
- redtheo@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window