POORS ALLOTMENT (OTHERWISE THE POOR RAND TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust currently receives no monies, Any maintenance costs have to be met from our funds, payments are made to any person within the Parish with genuine need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 April 1965: Standard registration
- HERRINGFLEET POORRAND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Allen | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Margaret Stevens | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Salama | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Varney | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Allison | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Crisp | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL OLIVIA ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET MAUREEN PITCHERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD 1819
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF HERRINGFLEET.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HERRINGFLEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Hillcrest Road
BECCLES
Suffolk
NR34 9YF
- Phone:
- 07711062103
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window