ST BOTOLPH ALDGATE UNION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 16 June 1965: Standard registration
- 25 February 1994: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 24 JUNE 1909, 26 MAY 1922 AND 22 JULY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF LONDON OR WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE ATTENDED AS PUPILS THE ALDGATE SCHOOL OF SIR JOHN CASS'S FOUNDATION IN THE FORMER PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH, ALDGATE OR SIR JOHN CASS'S FOUNDATION AND RED COAT CHURCH OF ENGLAND SECONDARY SCHOOL, AT STEPNEY, AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF SCHEME DATED 22 JULY 1982)
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.