UNKNOWN DONOR'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AIDING, FINANCIALLY, CHILDREN IN THE PARISH WITH THEIR EDUCATION THROUGH GRANTS AND ASSISTING STRUGGLING PENSIONERS WITH LIVING COSTS. ANY ASSISTANCE REQUIRED EDUCATIONALLY OR SOCIALLY IN THE PARISH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 01 May 1970: Standard registration
- WAREHORNE UNKNOWN DONOR'S CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Barden | Chair | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Taylor | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
KELLY O'LEARY-WHITE | Trustee | 07 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS P BATT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80k | £1.81k | £2.58k | £1.79k | £2.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £855 | £2.98k | £1.46k | £1.48k | £1.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DETERMINATION ORDER OF 22ND MAY 1903 AND SCHEME DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1919
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WAREHORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HARDENS VIEW
WAREHORNE
ASHFORD
TN26 2LG
- Phone:
- 01233733877
- Email:
- pamandel3@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window