Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF REVEREND JOHN GEORGE COTTON BROWNE

Charity number: 241435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 February 2024 09 January 2025 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2023 09 January 2025 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2022 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2021 10 March 2022 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2020 29 March 2021 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2020 Not Required