THE CHARLES PURSER CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meet once a year - agree on names of elderly people in our village to whom we donate the interest accrued during the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 22 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Joy Parker | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Christine Orford | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
REVD ROBERT WARD | Trustee | 04 December 2007 |
|
|||||||
Dr Sarah Elizabeth Herriot | Trustee | 23 November 1999 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52 | £53 | £54 | £55 | £55 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £50 | £50 | £50 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 28TH OCTOBER 1918.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE EXPENDED ON COAL FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH AT DISCRETION OF TRUSTEES PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS (IF ANY).
Area of benefit
CRADLEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hopehouse Farm
Ridgeway Cross
Cradley
Malvern
WR13 5JQ
- Phone:
- 01886880146
- Email:
- bruce.herriot@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window