EASTWOOD COLLIERIES MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing opportunities for members to meet together at weekly choir practice sessions and develop their singing capabilities in a non-threatening and welcoming environment. Performing at formal and informal events to entertain local communities and help raise money for good causes and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 1965: Standard registration
- ECMVC (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Mark Baxter | Chair | 17 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Shaw | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Philip Stone | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Anthony Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Joseph Banner | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Edwards | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Randall | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Woodliffe Wright | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Thomas Bethell | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR DOUG WILCOCKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Terence Roy Fredrick Cooper | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.47k | £5.61k | £5.65k | £7.19k | £18.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.59k | £5.23k | £6.42k | £11.33k | £10.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JANUARY 1960 AS AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1981 AND 10 JULY 2007 AND 2 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
56B MANSFIELD ROAD
BRINSLEY
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 5AE
- Phone:
- 07802758223
- Email:
- secretary@ecmvc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window