COTTERILL'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefit of pensioners in the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 30 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY SWINBOURNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kevin John Clough | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE AMANDA KEETLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £803 | £818 | £831 | £1.09k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £635 | £105 | £728 | £1.03k | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HILL CROOMBE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY WHICH MAY INCLUDE GRANTS TO ANY ALMSHOUSE OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID : PROVIDED THAT INCOME SHALL NOT BE APPLIED DIRECTLY IN RELIEF OF RATES TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS BUT MAY BE APPLIED IN SUPPLEMENTING RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE PROVIDED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
HILL CROOME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vine Cottage
Baughton
Earls Croome
WORCESTER
WR8 9DQ
- Phone:
- 07764 431249
- Email:
- cotterillscharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window