Governing document LADY WHITE AND POOR'S CHARITIES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2ND JULY 1858 ESTABLISHED BY COUNTY COURT ORDER OF 22 OCTOBER 1858, COUNTY COURT ORDER OF 5 NOVEMBER 1858, SCHEME OF 27 JULY 1900 AND DETERMINATION ORDER OF 6 MARCH 1906 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
15S TO THE MOST DESERVING POOR OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF TUXFORD FOR BREAD. 10/- TO THE INCUMBENT OF THE PARISH OF TUXFORD FOR PREACHING A SERMON AND ADMINISTERING THE SACRAMENT ON GOOD FRIDAY. RESIDUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DESERVING POOR RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF TUXFORD EITHER IN FUEL CLOTHING OR OTHER NECESSARIES OR COMFORTS OR IN GIFTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TUXFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.