MARY LEEKE

Charity Number: 241608
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Council

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014

Total income: £10,478
Total expenditure: £12,936

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART JOHN BODILL Chair
None on record
JONATHAN FRANK PEAKE Trustee 04 April 2012
None on record
ROBERT MICHAEL SANSOM Trustee
None on record
GRANVILLE ROBERT MAY Trustee
None on record
SUSAN MARY SANTOS Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER OLIVER Trustee
None on record
MARGARET BELSHAW Trustee
None on record
EPPERSTONE PARISH COUNCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £23.54k £12.04k £10.48k
Total expenditure £15 £15 £27.77k £9.30k £12.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
PRINTED REPORT VOLUME 20 PAGE 514.
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF THE WIDOWS AND MOST NECESSITOUS POOR PERSONS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
EPPERSTONE
Registration history
  • 04 May 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
6 GONALSTON LANE
EPPERSTONE
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6BA
Phone:
No information available
Website:

No information available