WILLIAMS FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 19 July 1966: Standard registration
- 15 September 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 15 September 2005: Funds transferred to 233699 WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST AND OTHE...
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MINUTES DATED 25 JUNE 1879, AND SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
EDUCATION OF ROMAN CATHOLIC SECULAR PRIESTS AND SUPPORT OF POOR MISSIONS. [SEE SCHEME DATED 9 JUNE 2005 - 50% OF THE ASSETS OF THE CHARITY ARE TRANSFERRED BY THIS SCHEME TO WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST AND OTHER TRUST FUNDS ADMINISTERED BY THE WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUSTEE. THE ASSETS ARE TO BE HELD AS PERMANENT ENDOWMENT FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPORTING THE WORK CARRIED OUT BY MISSIONS. 50% OF THE ASSETS OF THE CHARITY ARE TRANSFERRED BY THIS SCHEME TO THE WESTMINSTER ECCLESIASTICAL EDUCATION FUND (ALSO KNOWN AS THE FUND FOR THE TRAINING OF YOUNG MEN FOR THE PRIESTHOOD)].
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.