BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of hobby and activity sharing groups for people aged 50+.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 10 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Rosemary Gorst | Chair | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Norma Mary Yardley Burke | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Anderson Hon. Ald | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PENNY WAGG | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE MARY WILKES | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GUY RD DL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.26k | £45.52k | £54.08k | £53.02k | £59.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.59k | £53.89k | £65.34k | £52.17k | £51.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RESOLUTION APPROVED 11 MARCH 1965 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 1993 AND 12 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE ATTAINED THE AGE OF FIFTY YEARS AND HAVE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT OR ARE REACHING RETIREMENT. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC BACKGROUND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND THE MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Norman Leaker Centre
1237 Stratford Road
Hall Green
Birmingham
West Midlands
B28 9AA
- Phone:
- 01217777502
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window