Financial history CHARITY OF SUSANNA HALL

Charity number: 241682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.00k £1.01k £1.06k £1.40k £1.16k
Total expenditure £977 £977 £950 £1.06k £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A