SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a)Provide a forum for those interested in the arts, to advocate the provision of all the arts in Shrewsbury and its surrounding districts and to assist in the organisation thereof where necessary and possible; b)promote excellence, innovation and diversity in professional performances, exhibitions and workshops c)enable more people to experience the arts d)support amateur arts associations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS ALEXANDER GUTMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kate Cameron Taylor | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Ivan Chabluk | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79k | £342 | £248 | £193 | £710 | |
|
Total expenditure | £194 | £0 | £0 | £77 | £997 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1965 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 1966, 20 JUNE 1967. 15 SEPTEMBER 1980 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 1981. as amended on 28 Feb 2018 as amended on 28 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
ENCOURAGEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND CO-ORDINATION OF CULTURAL ACTIVITIES IN SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT PARTICULARLY IN THE FIELDS OF MUSIC, DRAMA, LITERATURE AND THE VISUAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Darwin Street
Shrewsbury
SY3 8QE
- Phone:
- 01743537286
- Email:
- tandjgutman@outlook.com
- Website:
-
gateway-gallery3.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window