THE GRANADA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to further the following objectives: - To encourage and promote the study practice and appreciation of the fine arts - To encourage and promote the study and application of the sciences. - To promote and advance education. - To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure-time occupation in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cumbria
- Derbyshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
Governance
- 22 June 1965: Standard registration
- 22 November 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1206376 THE GRANADA FOUNDATION
- THE NORTHERN ARTS AND SCIENCES FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.97k | £34.35k | £23.88k | £28.11k | £32.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.29k | £238.07k | £253.40k | £141.86k | £245.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 8 MARCH 1965 AND SCHEME OF 10 NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
(A) TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF THE FINE ARTS WHICH FOR THIS PURPOSE SHALL BY DEEMED TO INCLUDE PAINTING, DRAWING, ARCHITECTURE, SCULPTURE, LITERATURE, MUSIC, OPERA, DRAMA, BALLET, CINEMA AND THE METHODS AND MEANS OF THEIR DISSEMINATION. (B) TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE STUDY AND APPLICATION OF THE SCIENCES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DEED OF SETTLEMENT.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window