POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons resident in the parish of Watlington who are in need, hardship or distress or sick, convalescent, disabled or infirm by relieving their suffering or assisting their recovery. In exceptional cases the Trustees may decide to assist someone (who must otherwise be qualified) who is resident immediately outside the area of benefit or only temporarily resident in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 May 1965: Standard registration
- WATLINGTON SUPPORT FUND (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLA ANN STAFFORD | Chair | 30 May 2011 |
|
|||
Trevor John Didcock | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||
Rev Valerie Kearney | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|||
Andrew Peter David Aherne | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||
Jacqueline Hocking | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||
David John Tindale | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||
Margaret Elizabeth Barton | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|||
DOREEN MARY HOBBS | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|||
ROSALIND WALMSLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.10k | £32.71k | £33.71k | £37.15k | £40.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.67k | £14.54k | £24.58k | £14.92k | £35.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
09 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24TH JULY 1961 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 6TH MARCH 1992 UNDER SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1985 AND BY SCHEME DATED 26 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 17 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION PASSED 20 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT AS ALTERED UNDER SECTION 2 ARE TO BE TO RELIEVE GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THE PERSONS IN NEED IN THE PARISH OF WATLING (SEE NOTICE FOR FULL DETAILS)
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WATLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Old School Place
Watlington
OX49 5QH
- Phone:
- 01491613366
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window