Financial history TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY OF THE BERNARDINE SISTERS

Charity Number: 241743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £550.95k £441.92k £343.22k £459.37k £503.76k
Total expenditure £489.61k £531.64k £592.89k £683.66k £565.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £50.70k N/A N/A N/A £45.74k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £322.72k N/A N/A N/A £306.86k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £177.53k N/A N/A N/A £151.16k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £32.90k N/A N/A N/A £15.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £435.19k N/A N/A N/A £499.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £54.42k N/A N/A N/A £65.90k
Expenditure - Governance £13.38k N/A N/A N/A £11.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £54.42k N/A N/A N/A £65.90k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0