Linked charities DENBIGHSHIRE BRANCH OF THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY
Charity number: 241780
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED ON 11/02/1957
ORDER UNDER MORTMAIN 01/11/1957
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/07/2012
Charitable objects
HOME FOR OLD AGE PENSIONERS
Area of benefit
DENBIGHSHIRE
Registration history
- 16 July 1965 : Standard registration
- 14 September 1992 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.