Charity overview ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
Charity Number: 204665-57
Removed charity
Governing document
FEOFFMENT DATED 16 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1627. SCHEME OF 2 NOVEMBER 1926 AND SCHEME OF 28 JULY 1942 AND 26 APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO POOR MEN OVER 55 YEARS.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL.
Registration history
- 27 April 1962: Standard registration
- 10 October 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1109141-16 BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARIT...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.