THE STUDENT CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of SCM is to advance the Christian religion among past and present students of universities, schools, colleges and other institutions of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 May 1966: Standard registration
- 20 March 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 March 2012: Funds transferred to 1125640 THE STUDENT CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT
- S C M (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.79k | £72.04k | £85.18k | £69.55k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.25k | £102.46k | £101.30k | £86.19k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 28 July 2011 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 30 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 30 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 06 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 06 April 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1969, 30TH MARCH 1974, 16TH OCTOBER 1977, 29TH SEPTEMBER 1979, 23 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONG PAST AND PRESENT STUDENTS OF UNIVERSIDIES, COLLEGES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window