Governing document THE STUDENT CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT
Charity Number: 241896
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1969, 30TH MARCH 1974, 16TH OCTOBER 1977, 29TH SEPTEMBER 1979, 23 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONG PAST AND PRESENT STUDENTS OF UNIVERSIDIES, COLLEGES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.