JAMES HAYES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable causes associated with Glass
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Frederick Reid | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Anthony Wenham | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEIGH BAILDHAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P.R. 32 PT. 2 P. 478 SCHEME OF THE 23RD APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
IN MAKING GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF IN CASES OF NEED OF MEMBERS OF THE GLASS-SELLERS COMPANY OF THE CITY OF LONDON AND THEIR WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS AND SUBJECT THERETO IN MAKING GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN ANY OF THE GLASS INDUSTRY, NAMELY, THE MANUFACTURING, WHOLESALE AND RETAIL BRANCHES, AND THEIR WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDENTS.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
238 Nelson Road
Whitton
TWICKENHAM
TW2 7BW
- Phone:
- 07596418127
- Email:
- charity@glass-sellers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window