Accounts and annual returns CHRISTOPHER COOKE

Charity number: 241913
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 March 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required