Financial history BOLTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 241929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.78k £19.17k £2.22k £604 £1.10k
Total expenditure £3.75k £8.36k £2.05k £120 £850
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.00k N/A N/A N/A