POUND SQUARE UNITARIAN CHAPEL

Charity number: 241959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NON CREDAL RELIGIOUS ACTIVITY, including baptisms, weddings, funeral services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,154
Total expenditure: £8,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT KENNETH Goddard Trustee 05 July 2021
THE WESTERN UNION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES
Received: On time
Stephen Michael Dadson Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Steve Kinsman Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
CHARLES ARGALL Trustee 28 May 2011
None on record
MRS KATH RYDER Trustee 12 April 1994
None on record
SUSAN PETTIFER Trustee
None on record
LINDA MCCARTHY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.29k £8.54k £8.90k £11.77k £10.15k
Total expenditure £7.35k £9.50k £8.64k £8.81k £8.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2021 346 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES DATED 24 AUGUST 1894 AND 16 JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO BE APPLIED IN REPAIRING THE CHAPEL OR FOR THE MINISTER THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 December 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
5 Meadow Park Drive
Burrington
Umberleigh
Devon
EX37 9TY
Phone:
01769520514
Website:

No information available