ROYAL MICROSCOPICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our object is to promote the advancement of microscopical science through the discussion and publication of research into improvements in the construction and mode of application of microscopes and into those branches of science where microscopy is important, and to organise educational activities concerned with microscopy for the benefit of the general public and for the science community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,886,206
Donations and legacies | £14.43k | |
Charitable activities | £1.76m | |
Other trading activities | £25.00k | |
Investments | £81.98k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,879,639
Raising funds | £41.28k | |
Charitable activities | £1.84m | |
Other | £2.52k |
£125,327 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £43.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.84m | |
Retained for future use | £6.57k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £43.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.84m | |
Retained for future use | £131.89k |
People

14 Employee(s)
23 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Roland Fleck | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Katherine Paine | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHOEBE CLARICE WHITLOCK | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jamie Hobbs | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eric Prestat | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Self | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yanping Guo | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kurt Anderson | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Baldycheva | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steven Thomas | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Rik Drummond-Brydson | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Claire Wells | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Paul Verkade | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Donald MacLaren | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Sossick | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Parker | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rod Shipley | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kerry Thompson | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andy Brown | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Maddy Parsons | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHELLE PECKHAM | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER O'TOOLE PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09m | £1.24m | £1.16m | £1.40m | £1.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04m | £1.32m | £1.09m | £1.53m | £1.88m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £69.02k | £4.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.02k | £97.54k | £7.33k | £8.08k | £14.43k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £74.00k | £9.00k | £11.70k | £24.01k | £25.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.91m | £1.07m | £1.07m | £1.28m | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £83.33k | £65.41k | £67.42k | £92.03k | £81.98k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £1.28m | £1.05m | £1.48m | £1.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £40.19k | £40.35k | £43.70k | £42.76k | £41.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £66.48k | £26.72k | £28.01k | £51.89k | £37.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £32.87k | £96.72k | £17.70k | £309.57k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £40.19k | £40.35k | £43.70k | £42.76k | £41.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £29.82k | £2.33k | £2.18k | £1.88k | £2.52k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £661.26k | £655.88k | £693.29k | £666.31k | £656.27k | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.43m | £3.56m | £4.27m | £3.78m | £3.87m | |
|
Other assets | £1.16m | £1.04m | £950.21k | £1.14m | £1.11m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £445.13k | £369.35k | £143.91k | £394.81k | £312.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 28TH AUGUST 1867 AND BY-LAWS AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 1972, 1973, 1974, 1978, 15TH MAY 1980 AND 21ST MAY 1984, AMENDED 3 JULY 2000 as amended on 03 Jul 2019 And Royal Charter granted on 23 Jan 2023as amended by an Order in Council on 23 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MICROSCOPICAL SCIENCE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DISCUSSION AND PULBICATION OF RESEARCH INTO IMPROVEMENTS IN THE CONSTRUCTION AND MODE OF APPLICATION OF MICROSCOPES AND INTO THOSE BRACHES OF SCIENCE WHERE MICROSCOPY IS IMPORTANT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37-38 St Clements
Oxford
OX4 1AJ
- Phone:
- 01865254760
- Email:
- info@rms.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window