Trustees ROYAL MICROSCOPICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 241990
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Steven Thomas | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Rik Drummond-Brydson | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kurt Anderson | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Baldycheva | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Donald MacLaren | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Sossick | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Verkade | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Parker | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Claire Wells | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dogan Ozkaya | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Asa Barber | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul French | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Liam Rooney | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Hogg | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rod Shipley | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gunning | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Oleg Kolosov | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Grace Burke | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kerry Thompson | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andy Brown | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Maddy Parsons | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHELLE PECKHAM | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER O'TOOLE PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.