THE BIRMINGHAM PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place of worship and facilities for religious education and instruction for Jewish people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 04 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Neuberg | Chair | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prince Adusei | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Eaton | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADELA PAULA KOBIC | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.18k | £134.25k | £114.35k | £93.11k | £183.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.83k | £94.16k | £92.12k | £101.50k | £79.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 273 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF MAY 1963 AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1969 AND 16TH MAY 1973. AS AMENDED ON THE 12TH JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 05 APR 2017
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PROGRESSIVE JUDAISM; B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND TO ARRANGE AND CONDUCT RELIGIOUS SERVICES; C) TO PROVIDE, ARRANGE AND CONDUCT RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; D) TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE SOLEMNIZATION OF MARRIAGES; E) TO MAKE PROVISION FOR BURIAL AND CREMATION; F) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF PROSELYTES UNDER THE RULES OF LIBERAL JUDAISM. G) TO PERFORM SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; H) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER ACTS AND THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE AFORESAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHOPGATE STREET / ROSELAND WAY
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1HD
- Phone:
- 01216343888
- Email:
- office@bpsjudaism.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window