CHARITY OF CLEMENT WINSTANLEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical comforts for the poor of the parishes of Ingatestone, Fryerning and Margaretting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 21 May 1965: Standard registration
- 04 May 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 264396 THE INGATESTONE AND FRYERNING NURSING TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE LETTER RECEIVED 6TH JANUARY 1949 ON F.63736.
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF MEDICAL APPLIANCES AND COMFORTS FOR THE SICK POOR OF THE PARISHES OF INGATESTONE, FRYERNING AND MARGARETTING.
Area of benefit
INGATESTONE, FRYERNING AND MARGARETTING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window