Financial history THE EVEREST TRUST

Charity number: 242242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £38.41k £39.52k £43.64k £54.47k £46.81k
Total expenditure £48.25k £49.05k £45.00k £36.00k £40.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A