HAYES PRESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith by the publication and dissemination of Christian literature in any medium, and in particular but without limitation literature connected with churches of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEX JARVIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Robert Jones | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ASHLEY BOWLER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.32k | £90.00k | £80.26k | £80.84k | £101.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.59k | £110.00k | £103.13k | £134.92k | £113.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH JANUARY 1962 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 6TH OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE IN ANY MEDIUM, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCHES OF GOD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BARN
FLAXLANDS
WOOTTON BASSETT
SWINDON
SN4 8DY
- Phone:
- 07341379815
- Email:
- sales@hayespress.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window