Accounts and annual returns SOCIETY OF AFRICAN MISSIONS - TRUST PROPERTY AT ORE PLACE HASTINGS HELD IN CONNEXION WITH -
Charity Number: 242305
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2021 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 02 September 2021 | 672 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 July 2021 | 996 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window