WHITTLEWOOD OTHERWISE WHITLEBURY CHARITIES

Charity number: 242352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MAKING DONATIONS FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED IN INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS IN THE PARISHES OF POTTERSPURY AND YARDLEY GOBION.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OGLE AND WHITTLEBURY FOREST CHARITY (Working name)
  • POTTERSPURY AND YARDLEY GOBION COMBINED CHARITIES (Working name)
  • WHITTLEBURY FOREST CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEORGINA MAY DIMMOCK Trustee
CLARKE'S GIFTS
Received: On time
NICHOLAS SAXBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ELLA BERRILL CHRISTMAS BENEFACTION
Received: On time
OGLE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN KING Trustee
CLARKE'S GIFTS
Received: On time
NICHOLAS SAXBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ELLA BERRILL CHRISTMAS BENEFACTION
Received: On time
OGLE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ROBERT WILLIAM WESTLAKE Trustee
CLARKE'S GIFTS
Received: On time
NICHOLAS SAXBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ELLA BERRILL CHRISTMAS BENEFACTION
Received: On time
OGLE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH FRANCES RICHMOND WATSON Trustee
CLARKE'S GIFTS
Received: On time
NICHOLAS SAXBY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ELLA BERRILL CHRISTMAS BENEFACTION
Received: On time
OGLE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNLIN CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23 £23 £23 £24 £25
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 November 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
53 EASTFIELD CRESCENT
YARDLEY GOBION
TOWCESTER
NN12 7TT
Phone:
01908542414
Website:

No information available