Financial history LANGLEY PUBLIC INSTITUTE

Charity number: 242372
Charity reporting is up to date (147 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.40k £23.60k £20.72k £23.83k £24.61k
Total expenditure £12.15k £7.86k £10.70k £12.30k £13.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A