RAINFORD WELFARE AND OLD FOLK'S TREAT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services to the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 14 July 1965: Standard registration
- RAINFORD SENIOR CITIZENS SOCIAL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Woods | Chair | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
STUART BARDSLEY | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Nuttall Mrs | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Woods | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE ALWYN SCHOLEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANN LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PEGGY LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA GUEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA PATTISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN WESLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR LES GUEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA PYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.09k | £1.83k | £6.12k | £8.31k | £11.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.69k | £2.43k | £9.71k | £12.03k | £15.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MINUTES OF 13 APRIL 1934 AND 18 OCTOBER 1974 as amended on 28 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
The relief of those in need because of age in the Civil Parish of Rainford
Area of benefit
RAINFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Rookery Lane
Rainford
ST. HELENS
Merseyside
WA11 8BL
- Phone:
- 01744882533
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window