CHARITY OF MARY HANDY MERCER
Charity number: 242394
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help the poor and needy and eductional needs of needy children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Total income: £19
Total expenditure: £19
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Worcestershire
Governance
Registration history:
- 26 May 1965: Standard registration
- 20 May 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 20 May 2016: Funds transferred to 242489 THE VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS EDUCATION AND IN NEED ...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- P C C OF KEMPSEY - VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19 | £19 | £19 | £3 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19 | £19 | £19 | £3 | £19 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 November 2015 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 20 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 15 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 27TH AUGUST 1880. (U.V.47 P.384).
Charitable objects
FOR BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF KEMPSEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window