Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE DUKE OF YORK YORK'S ROYAL MILITARY SCHOOL AMENITIES FUND
Charity number: 307938-2
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 30.03.1990 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 12.09.1972 21.04.1964
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE SCHOOL OF FACILITIES (INCLUDING LANDS AND BUILDINGS OF ANY KIND OR TENURE) FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF STUDENTS OF THE SCHOOL IN SO FAR AS THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES IS CHARITABLE AT LAW AND IS NOT TO BE EXPECTED FROM PUBLIC MONIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 30 January 1967: Standard registration
- 19 March 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 March 2009: Funds transferred to 1128684 THE DUKIES FOUNDATION
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.