Register of Charities - The Charity Commission 28TH DIVISIONAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity number: 307938-3
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTER DATED 04.03.1920 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 21.04.1964 AS AMENDED BY S74 RESOLUTION DATED 6 MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
THE ASSISTANCE OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL TO OBTAIN FURTHER EDUCATION AFTER THEY HAVE LEFT THE INSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 30 January 1967: Standard registration
- 19 March 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 March 2009: Funds transferred to 1128684 THE DUKIES FOUNDATION
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.