Financial history THE INCORPORATED ANGLO-AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSISTANCE FUND

Charity number: 242436
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.31k £34.26k £25.42k £23.48k £39.79k
Total expenditure £77.74k £72.95k £73.08k £68.73k £56.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A