THE INCORPORATED ANGLO-AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSISTANCE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose and activity of the Fund is to render assistance to American and British citizens in Italy in connection with hardship arising from ill health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Italy
Governance
- 18 June 1965: Standard registration
- THE INCORPORATED ANGLO-AMERICAN NURSING HOME (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Bennie McGhie | Chair | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Joseph Berrios | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev John William Kilgore | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Margaret Pereira | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Warren | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DONALD CARROLL | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.31k | £34.26k | £25.42k | £23.48k | £39.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.74k | £72.95k | £73.08k | £68.73k | £56.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1902 AS AMENDED 29TH MAY 1953, 5TH MAY 1964 AND 3RD JULY 1974 as amended on 17 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Association is established are: To render assistance to persons of British and American nationality in Italy who are in ill health and who in the opinion of the Association are deserving of such assistance and in particular by providing nurses and making loans or paying either in whole or in part for accommodation and for the services of doctors, surgeons and nurses whether in a hospital, a nursing home or in private apartments as well as for such medical treatment, surgical appliances and medicines as may from time to time be prescribed for such persons
Area of benefit
ITALY
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o St. Paul's Church
Via Napoli 58
00184 Rome
- Phone:
- 00393299659636
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window