Accounts and annual returns WREXHAM MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 242474
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 May 2023 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 April 2024 450 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 April 2024 815 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 April 2024 1180 days late Download Open in new window