PHILADELPHIA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See attached accounts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 15 December 1965: Standard registration
- P A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joachim Richter | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Cole | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Mercer | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Morag Cleland | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN DAVID BLUESTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ELMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.68k | £151.70k | £156.44k | £193.37k | £225.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.59k | £156.35k | £214.42k | £196.34k | £220.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH APRIL 1965 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 2ND NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE MENTAL ILLNESS OF ALL DESCRIPTIONS AND IN PARTICULAR SCHIZOPHRENIA. 2. TO PROVIDE OR FURTHER THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM MENTAL ILLNESS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION OR OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION BY WAY OF TREATMENT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 MARTYS YARD
17 HAMPSTEAD HIGH STREET
LONDON
NW3 1QW
- Phone:
- 02077942652
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window