Financial history THE VICTORY TRUST

Charity number: 242526
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.21k £15.38k £4.40k £52.67k £58.71k
Total expenditure £53.77k £64.16k £39.80k £61.24k £72.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A