THE VICTORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides a Club for ex-service men and women and their families, of Cheltenham and district, to relax and enjoy social contact with each other. The Club is in the process of development and aims to provide a first class environment for these activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 March 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim harman | Chair | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bailey | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Kelly | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
COLIN FREWIN | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HODGSON | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.21k | £15.38k | £4.40k | £52.67k | £58.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.77k | £64.16k | £39.80k | £61.24k | £72.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 3RD JULY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 JUNE 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BY CHARITABLE MEANS THE WELFARE OF EX-SERVICEMEN AND EX-SERVICEWOMEN AND CHELTENHAM SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN AND THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH EX-SERVICEMEN AND EX-SERVICEWOMAN AND SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN AND IN PARTICULAR SO AS TO ASSIST EX-SERVICEMEN AND EX-SERVICEMEN IN THEIR RETURN TO CIVILIAN LIFE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CHELTENHAM AND NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 FRAMPTON MEWS
THE REDDINGS
CHELTENHAM
GL51 6UG
- Phone:
- 07881807801
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window