REYNOLDS TEAGUE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reynolds Teaque Homes are a small group of 8 Alms houses providing accomodation for long term and elderly residents of Stow On The Wold and district with limited means. Residents pay a contribution towards the maintenance of the Alms houses as opposed to an economical rent. All repairs and improvements to the properties are carried out by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 June 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jill Roddan | Chair | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Gum | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Gum | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernice Magson | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Teague | Trustee | 12 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Keyte | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MAGSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD LEWIS DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID WILSON GLAISYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.49k | £29.04k | £25.69k | £29.69k | £34.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.26k | £37.04k | £19.96k | £45.92k | £12.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27TH APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
THE RESIDENTS OF THE WALTER REYNOLDS HOMES SHALL BE POOR PERSONS WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE NOT LESS THAN 65 YEARS OF AGE AND ARE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STOW-ON-THE-WOLD WITH A PREFERENCE FOR MEMBERS OR ADHERENTS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OTHER PROTESTANT DENOMINATIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STOW-ON-THE-WOLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENDALL & DAVIES
STATION ROAD
BOURTON-ON-THE-WATER
CHELTENHAM
GL54 2AA
- Phone:
- 01451820277
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window