Trustees REYNOLDS TEAGUE HOMES

Charity number: 242558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Jill Roddan Chair 22 September 2020
None on record
Mike Gum Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Kate Gum Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Bernice Magson Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Paul Teague Trustee 12 August 2017
None on record
Helen Keyte Trustee 06 July 2017
None on record
DEREK MAGSON Trustee
THE ALEXANDER CHARITY OF STOW-ON-THE-WOLD
Received: On time
RICHARD LEWIS DAVIES Trustee
HORLOCK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID WILSON GLAISYER Trustee
None on record