Financial history THE BIRMINGHAM AND DISTRICT BUTCHERS AND PORK BUTCHERS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 242561
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £3.78k £3.71k £5.21k £3.38k £4.45k
Total expenditure £3.63k £3.63k £2.65k £3.24k £4.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A