SPIRITUAL TRUTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTION OF SPIRITUALISM by holding meetings specifically for non spiritualists GRANTS FOR THHE RELIEF OF POVERTY among Spiritualists in need or with unusaul expenditure
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 1968: Standard registration
- STF (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret Farrow | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stuart Michael Neale | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Francoise Weyns | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICOLAS JOHN WHITHAM | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.06k | £14.19k | £14.85k | £17.06k | £21.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.17k | £8.99k | £12.55k | £13.46k | £13.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 APRIL 1965 AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 2 JUNE 1998. AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO BE HELD UPON SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WITH A VIEW TO ATTAINING ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING:- 1) PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM. 2) THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF SPIRITUAL HEALING. 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 16
ST. MICHAELS COURT
2B BRUNSWICK GROVE
LONDON
N11 1HW
- Phone:
- 07540565454
- Email:
- emailsft@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window