GWENT WILDLIFE TRUST LTD

Charity Number: 242619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gwent Wildlife Trust has a vision of an environment rich in wildlife for everyone. We work to rebuild biodiversity and engage people with their environment. We manage land, campaign for wildlife, provide advice and promote enjoyment and appreciation of wildlife.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Blaenau Gwent
  • Caerphilly
  • Monmouthshire
  • Newport City
  • Torfaen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GWENT WILDLIFE TRUST (Working name)
  • MONMOUTHSHIRE NATURALISTS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
  • THE GWENT TRUST FOR NATURE CONSERVATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marc Leppard Chair 15 September 2021
None on record
Dr Mary Barkham Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Tom Abbey Smith Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Juliet Holt-Wilson Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Tim Rathbone Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Mavis Mckenzie Cecil Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Richard Hugh Howell Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Lucy Holland Ford Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
David Rees Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
Jonathan Marten Henry Stephens Trustee 04 December 2017
None on record
Susan Mary Finn Trustee 16 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £984.26k £921.74k £1.45m £1.89m £1.43m
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.29m £1.23m £1.61m £1.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £480.36k £512.61k £876.45k £1.06m £74.87k
Income - Donations and legacies £324.98k £314.81k £465.94k £670.61k £421.62k
Income - Other trading activities £79.57k £23.42k £7.87k £26.50k £61.95k
Income - Charitable activities £535.15k £558.91k £945.40k £1.17m £870.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.56k £24.60k £27.74k £21.70k £33.19k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.98k £0 £38.25k
Income - Legacies £47.52k £1.97k £6.94k £345.32k £106.79k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.16m £1.11m £1.34m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £129.74k £132.95k £123.57k £261.79k £142.58k
Expenditure - Governance £36.13k £36.19k £103.94k £117.64k £31.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £12.72k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.88m £1.89m £2.01m £2.10m £2.11m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.50m £1.14m £1.21m £1.47m £1.41m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £18.14k £34.20k £12.86k £19.31k £80.37k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chestnut Suite
Mamhilad House
Mamhilad Park Estate
Mamhilad
Pontypool
NP4 0HZ
Phone:
01600740600